Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Smith, Matthew, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Smith, Cristina, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryDv Prevention With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Request for Order - DV/TRO Judge: Richardson, Paul K. |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service BY PERSONAL SERVICE SERVED CHRISTINA A SMITH WITH DV-120 ON 3/1/2021 |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document Sent To COURTROOM CLERK - PETITIONER'S EVIDENCE |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - No Fee FILED BY MATTHEW CHARLES SMITH |
|
February 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (in Person) (CLETS) (Domestic Violence) PERSONALLY SERVED CRISTINA SMITH WITH DV-109, DV-100, AND BLANK DV-120 ON 2-16-2021 |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service SERVED CRITINA SMITH WITH REQUEST FOR DVTRO AND NOTICE OF HEARING PERSONALLY ON 2/16/2021 |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Denied Restraining Order | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Hearing (Domestic Violence) | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | *Domestic Violence Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.