Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Phillips, Anthony, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Phillips, Alissa, in the jurisdiction of Yolo County. This case was filed in Yolo County Superior Courts Superior with Maguire, Daniel P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaguire, Daniel P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryDissolution Without Minor Children |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationYolo County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
*Trial Setting Conference
Date: February 23, 2023*Motion
Date: August 08, 2023*Settlement Conference
Date: June 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
Family Law and Motion Minute Order Further Court Trial day 2 of 3 Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
*Trial: Long Cause Day 1 of 3 Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed FILED BY ATTNY FOR RESP ALISSA PHILLIPS Brief Filed |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Witness List Filed Proof of Service BY EMAIL WITH PER EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST TO BRIAN DAVALOS Witness List Filed |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service BY EMAIL WITH PER EXHIBIT AND WITNESS LIST TO BRIAN DAVALOS ON 1/5/24 | |
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | Amended Trial Brief AND WITNESS LIST | |
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order *Trial Readiness Conference and Re-set 3rd day of Trial as 1-15-24 was a Court Holiday Judge: Beronio, Janene |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Remote Appearance ATTORNEY KEITH BANKS |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF HEARING/TRIAL; ELECTRONICALLY SERVED BRIAN DAVALOS, ATTY FOR RESPONDENT, ON 1/02/24 WITH NOTICE OF HRG/TRIAL |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Filed Petitioner's Trial Brief and Witness List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.