Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Morris, Pamela, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Manzanilla, Leo A., against Castle Key Indemnity Company, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Timothy A. Register presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy A. Register Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event LACK OF PROSECUTION on 12/20/2021 1100 AM Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER results CANCELLED on 11/1/2021 | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 12/20/2021 at 1100 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL APPAISAL | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT, CASTLE KEY INDEMNITY COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINIFFS' COMPLAINT AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, CASTLE KEY INDEMNITY COMPANY'S, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY SERVED BY PLAINTIFF'S | |
December 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 672019CA000232CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/31/2019 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.