Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Staebell, Sharon, Staebell, Timothy, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Mubarak, Mohammad, against Universal Property And Casualt, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 07, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
CORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY TO JUDGE
Date: February 10, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: March 11, 2021REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFFS
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event HEARING on 5/20/2021 1000 AM Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER results CANCELLED on 5/18/2021 | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS, TIMOTHY STABELL AND SHARON STABELL'S MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT, UNIVERSAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION & FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 5/20/2021 at 1000 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.