Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
South State Bank, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Locke, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 24, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
RECORDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF REPLEVLIN
Date: May 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO COUNT II OF THE VERIFIED COMPLAINT | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF REPLEVLIN | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Event MOTION HEARING scheduled on 5/20/2021 at 0945 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE OF REPLEVIN | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED ON MATTHEW LOCKE | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND CASE CAPTION | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF REPLEVIN- EMAILED TO ATTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.