Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First Federal Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Church, Kelley Louise, against Dansby, Lealon M, Freeman, Kimbraly M, Hillary Kirkland As Personal R, Kirkland, Franklin H, Kirkland, Hillary, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedOctober 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a response from the Defendant, United States of America, to a complaint filed by First Federal Bank in the Circuit Court of the Fourteenth Judicial Circuit in Washington County, Florida. The Defendant admits the allegations in parag...
COMPLAINT SERVICECOPIES@QPWBLAW.COM
Date: October 15, 2019ANSWER/COUNTER TO COMPLAINT
Date: November 07, 2019MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT
Date: August 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | RECORDED CERTIFICATE OF TITILE | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 assessed at sum $27,717.00 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | BIDDER SHEET AND THIRD PARTY INFORMATION | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number 20 20004836 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 4 Total Assessed $27,717.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 21, 2020 | Docket Event | DISBURSEMENT REQUEST OF $27,300.00 SENT TO KEITH ON 10/21/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.