Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Faucheux, Diana Jo, Faucheux, Timothy J, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Smith, Douglas Latta, against Massey, Joseph, Massey, Sheena, Unknown Tenant 1, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Timothy A. Register presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTimothy A. Register Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 10, 2019 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $0-50,000 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a verified complaint for mortgage foreclosure filed by Timothy John Faucheux and Diana Jo Faucheux against Joseph Daniel Massey, Sheena Massey, and an unknown tenant. The plaintiffs, Faucheux, hold a note and mortgage for a property...
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: October 25, 2021COMPLAINT DSMITH@BURKEBLUE.COM
Date: October 10, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: October 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 12/20/2021 at 1100 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE SHEENA MASSEY SERVED, JOSEPH MASSEY SERVED, UNKNOWN TENANT 1 SERVED | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 672019CA000188CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/10/2019 | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to TIMOTHY J FAUCHEUX | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Judge: Assigned | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $430.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.