Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, Kristal, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-D case represented by Kandell, Scott Evan, against Anchor Property And Casualty I, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with REGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREGISTER, TIMOTHY ALLEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 28, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLANITIFF | |
September 25, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, ANCHOR PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ANCHOR PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY SERVED | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 672019CA000161CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/30/2019 | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney: Assigned to KRISTAL SMITH | |
August 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.