Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hatcher, Tonya, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Rosso, Scott Michael, against Security First Insurance Compa, represented by Richardson, Steven Kyle, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Christopher N. Patterson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher N. Patterson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2019 |
CategoryInsurance Claims |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 0300 PM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MANAGEMENT on 3/31/2022 0300 PM Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON results CANCELLED on 3/9/2022 | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION-JEFFREY BEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.