Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Arguello Cosby, Maria Garcia, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Ellis, Adam James, against Mhm Health Professionals Llc D, represented by Page, Cayla Mccrea, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with Allen L. Register presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllen L. Register Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2019 |
CategoryDiscrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
This complaint is filed by Maria Garcia Arguello Cosby against MHM Health Professionals, LLC, doing business as Centurion of Florida. The complaint alleges violations of Chapters 760 and 448 of the Florida Statutes. The nature of the action involves ...
COMPLAINT MARIE@MATTOXLAW.COM
Date: August 16, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Updated Event LACK OF PROSECUTION on 12/20/2021 1100 AM Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER results CANCELLED on 11/2/2021 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Event LACK OF PROSECUTION scheduled on 12/20/2021 at 1100 AM, CH - Judge TIMOTHY REGISTER presiding. | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OR PRIMARY AND SECONDARY EMAIL ADDRESSES ADAM@MATTOXLAW | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Plaintiff Attorney: Adam James Ellis Assigned to MARIA GARCIA ARGUELLO COSBY | |
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.