Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Williams, Erlene Francesca, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Richards, Craig Alexander, against K A Carriers Corp, Perez, Noel Suarez, S J Carriers Corp, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, FL, . Washington County, FL Superior Courts with PATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePATTERSON, CHRISTOPHER NIDA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashington County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE FOR TRIAL | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 3/31/2022 at 1000 AM, CH - Judge CHRISTOPHER PATTERSON presiding. | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, S&J CARRIERS CORP'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, K&A CARRIERS CORP | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT, K&A CARRIERS GROUP | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, S&J CARRIERS CORP'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES) | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, S&J CARRIERS CORP'S, CERTIFICATE OF FILING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge: PATTERSON , CHRISTOPHER N Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.