Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eric T Preston filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | covering 01/01/2022-12/31/2022 | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Eric T Preston Esq, 11/11/2021 - 06/06/2023 | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Eric T Preston from 11/11/2021-06/06/2023 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | covering 01/01/22 - 12/31/22 *audited | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Annual Accounting *E-svd and printed for mailing | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | set for 02/02/2023 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | of 4hr. Course issued to Michele Gelineau | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | to Cancel Hearing ORSC set on 02/02/23 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event | of Resident Agent by Sara Caldwell | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Failure to Comply, Esvd. & printed for mailing **Mailed on 12/13/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.