Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Donald R Filkins filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2021278079 Book: 8157 Page: 4685 View: 2021278079 | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | for Dsc. | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | & Acctg. by Corvair Preservation Foundation | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | by Donald Berding | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | & Acctg. by University of Rio Grande | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | & Acctg. | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | by Corvair Preservation Foundation | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Ntc. to Creditors w/evidence of delivery | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | of Ntc to Creditors 1st pub dtd 05/27/2021 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Estate Assets |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.