Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kimberley M Caron, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | dtd. 02/10/2012 Instrument: 2021040518 Book: 7994 Page: 4112 View: 2021040518 | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate Instrument: 2021040519 Book: 7994 Page: 4113 View: 2021040519 | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | testate summary (pro se) | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Diane Reinhold Caron | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | proved 2/10/2012 (4 pgs) Instrument: 2021040517 Book: 7994 Page: 4108 View: 2021040517 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | by Kimberley Caron | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOT DATED, *4 pages |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.