Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Carl Schwenker Iii filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2021 |
CategoryProbate/Formal |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed By Judge |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Instrument: 2022199503 Book: 8303 Page: 971 View: 2022199503 | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | for Dsc. | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Deed dtd 04/07/2022 | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Carl Schwenker III | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Michael Schwenker | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Full Waiver Rcpt of Benf Cns to Dsc by Valerie Schwenker | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | for Closing until 09/30/22 | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | for Discharge | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | by Valerie Schwenker | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | amended 1st pub 5/13/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.