Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Riccardo Martines, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate Instrument: 2021093275 Book: 8034 Page: 3122 View: 2021093275 | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | testate summary -reviewed amended documents filed. | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | & Amended Summary by Clelia Ellis | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Joseph J Kulunas (caveator) - Unable to forward | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Josephine Martines | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Josephine Martines | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | dated 07/02/14, *4 pages Instrument: 2021101516 Book: 8039 Page: 4670 View: 2021101516 | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Robert Martines Jr | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | To R Nadine David Esq re: Robert Martines Jr (Joseph J Kulunas Esq) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.