Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Justin R Dean, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2021 |
CategorySummary Administration $1,000 Or More |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed-Disposed Before Hearing |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | dtd. 10/03/1995 Instrument: 2021046658 Book: 7999 Page: 825 View: 2021046658 | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate Non-Resident Instrument: 2021046659 Book: 7999 Page: 826 View: 2021046659 | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Summary/Testate | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | from Atty. Pinizzotto | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Linda Gay Dean, State of West Virginia | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate from West Virginia Instrument: 2021046663 Book: 7999 Page: 845 View: 2021046663 | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Testate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.