Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
United States Of America, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Vilaboa-Abel, Christina, against Wimpy, April Leigh, Wimpy, William Daryn, in the jurisdiction of Union County, FL, . Union County, FL Superior Courts with GROEB, ROBERT KIRK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROEB, ROBERT KIRK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationUnion County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM DARYN WIMPY
Date: October 22, 2019RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: December 16, 2019RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: December 19, 2019MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING
Date: January 02, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT VACANT RESIDENCE
Date: January 07, 2020ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY
Date: January 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE WILLIAM DARYN WIMPY 12-18-19
Date: January 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED APRIL L WIMPY
Date: January 07, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED SPOUSE OF WILLIAM WIMPY IS NOT MARRIED
Date: January 07, 2020NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTIES
Date: January 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF ORIGINAL PROMISSORY NOTE
Date: February 20, 2020HEARING FORM
Date: February 20, 2020NOTICE OF ACTION (EMAILED TO UNION COUNTY TIMES ON 2-21-2020)
Date: February 20, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: February 21, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT OF WILLIAM DARYN WIMPY
Date: February 20, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: March 31, 2020NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS
Date: March 25, 2020NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 08, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: April 02, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE
Date: April 30, 2020NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT VIDEO CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS
Date: August 06, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: May 14, 2020NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS
Date: June 08, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: June 16, 2020HEARING FORM
Date: June 16, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: August 19, 2020NOTICE OF LIFT OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: June 23, 2020HEARING FORM
Date: August 14, 2020NOTICE FOR HEARING TO PROCEED BY VIDEO CONFERENCE
Date: July 14, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE APRIL WIMPY
Date: July 21, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE WILLIAM WIMPY
Date: July 21, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE WILLIAM DARYN WIMPY 8-13-2020
Date: August 20, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM DARYN WIMPY
Date: August 20, 2020HEARING FORM
Date: October 28, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT
Date: August 31, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: October 28, 2020HEARING NOTES
Date: December 14, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE APRIL WIMPY 10-21-2020
Date: October 28, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT OF APRIL WIMPY
Date: December 09, 2020REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 10, 2021HEARING FORM
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS
Date: December 13, 2020RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: December 28, 2020NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 07, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: January 06, 2021RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE
Date: February 16, 2021HEARING FORM
Date: April 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: August 15, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FOR
Date: August 15, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: August 15, 2019COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE
Date: August 15, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO APRIL WIMPY
Date: October 22, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO WILLIAM DARYN WIMPY
Date: October 22, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT
Date: October 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL UNDELIVERABLE | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE, SETTING CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 4/8/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Event Case Management scheduled on 2/4/2021 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge ROBERT GROEB presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.