Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Nesbitt, Roderick filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Weisel, Vincent J, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with NELSON, KATHRYN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNELSON, KATHRYN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADJL04E | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADJL04E | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: NO PARTIES PRESENT; NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 FAIL TO USE DESIGNATED LANE (316.089.3). ANY UNPAID TRAFFIC INFRACTIONS DISMISSED BY THE COURT. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 DISMISSED : . | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 1 | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | T3 SEQ: 1 | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL DOCKET CALL SET FOR 08/02/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 08/03/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, (PRESENCE WAIVED). PRIVATE ATTORNEY JONATHON R. ALFORD APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANT, OFC R. NESBITT WAS NOT PRESENT. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 FAIL TO USE DESIGNATED LANE (316.089.3). CASE ALSO SET FOR 8/3/2021 AT 8:30AM FOR JURY SELECTION. CONTINUED FOR: PRE-TRIAL DOCKET CALL: NEXT COURT DATE: 8/2/2021 08:30 AM WITH JUDGE NELSON K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.