Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Valencia, George filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gonzalez Hernandez, Gregorio, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with HENDRIKS, JEFFREY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENDRIKS, JEFFREY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Traffic |
Last RefreshedMarch 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | T3 SEQ: 1 | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 1 | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT AND ATTORNEY WERE NOT PRESENT, TPR G. VALENCIA WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 SPEED/70 INTERSTTE (REQUIRES SPEED) (316.187.2A-2). JUDGE DISMISSED INFRACTION. DEFENDANT WAS ALREADY SENTENCED ON CT CASE. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 DISMISSED : . | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA IN ABSENTIA (PLEA ACCEPTED 3/17/21 PER JUDGE) | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/22/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA IN ABSENTIA | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, PRIVATE ATTORNEY JOSE O. CASTANEDA JR. APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANT VIA TELECONFERENCE, AND ASA STEVEN R. PAKU WERE PRESENT VIA TELECONFERENCE. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 SPEED/70 INTERSTTE (REQUIRES SPEED) (316.187.2A-2). JUDGE WAIVED DEFT''S PRESENCE. CONTINUED FOR A PIA. CONTINUED FOR: HEARING: NEXT COURT DATE: 3/23/2021 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J. | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.