Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Levasseur, Erik filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Dawes, Laquan Lamont, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with HENDRIKS, JEFFREY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENDRIKS, JEFFREY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: DEFENDANT PRESENT VIA TELECONFERENCE, OFC E. LEVASSEUR WAS NOT PRESENT. NO PLEA ENTERED TO CT.1 EXPIRED REGISTRATION TAG(6MONTHS OR LESS) (320.07.3A). , DISPOSITION: CT.1 DISMISSED : . | |
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTE**TR GOES WITH 562021CT000175 A | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADJKY2E | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE HENDRIKS, JEFFREY: ASSIGNED | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT - CRIMINAL TRAFFIC SET FOR 02/16/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL CITATION RECEIVED FROM LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED SEQ: 1 - (320.07.3A) EXPIRED REGISTRATION TAG(6MONTHS OR LESS) | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 01/25/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR002072 A | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE ALONZO, EDMOND W: ASSIGNED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.