Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Castaneda, Sebastian, represented by Nelson, Jennifer A, Public Defender Unknown, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT - MISDEMEANOR SET FOR 03/02/2021 AT 3:30 PM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND RECEIVED ( V ) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NELSON, JENNIFER A ASSIGNED | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CASH BOND 29688 POSTED $500.00 | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 02/15/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/04/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000231 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.