Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Stone, Robert E Jr, against Crouch, Leon Antonio, represented by Nelson, Jennifer A, Public Defender Unknown, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V )
Date: February 03, 2021FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V )
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 03/07/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN M/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR COLLECTION COURT | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (Other.4588.1022 / 4845464) ( V ) | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney ROBERT E STONE JR - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney JENNIFER A NELSON - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH APD JENNIFER A. NELSONVIA TELECONFERENCE . ASA ROBERT E. STONE JR WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE VIA TELECONFERENCE. DEFT ADVISED OF I.N.S. RIGHTS. THE DEFENDANT WAS SWORN. AND DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.1 RESISTING OFFICER WITHOUT VIOLENCE (843.02). THE COURT FOUND FACTUAL BASIS AND ACCEPTED PLEA. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJUDICATED GUILTY : 120 DAYS COUNTY JAIL. CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED, 28 DAYS.. PAY WITHIN 30 DAYS, DUE DATE , AFTER RELEASE OR SET UP PAYMENT PLAN.. PAY: MM COST $223.00; COI $25.00; COP MM $100.00; PDFEES MM $50.00; PDAPP $50.00; BALANCE DUE = $448.00 . | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.