Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Stone, Robert E Jr, against Collier, Eugene, represented by Nelson, Jennifer A, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ISENHOWER, DARYL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeISENHOWER, DARYL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: STONE, ROBERT E JR ASSIGNED | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION ( V ) | |
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: NELSON, JENNIFER A ASSIGNED | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/01/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021MM000213 A | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT JAIL SET FOR 02/15/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 3C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENSE ATTORNEY: PUBLIC DEFENDER UNKNOWN ASSIGNED | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE ( V ) | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FIRST APPEARANCE/PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION/PROV APPT PD/NO CONTACT ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.