Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Paku, Steven Russell, against Rene, Nadia, represented by Couzens, Steven Edward, Jules-Toussaint, Natchia, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with NELSON, KATHRYN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNELSON, KATHRYN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )
Date: February 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND PSC51227887 (784.03.1A1) RELEASED | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: MEREUS, WILSON - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021MM000211 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RENE, NADIA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-2/22/2021" | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: JULES-TOUSSAINT, NATCHIA - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021MM000211 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. RENE, NADIA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NIF-2/22/2021" | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NO INFORMATION ( V ) | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL ASSIGNED | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO MODIFY PRE-TRIAL RELEASE (PTR) ( V ) | |
February 12, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V ) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.