Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Strohmenger, Andrew J, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Farquharson, Ronald Bruce, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with GRIFFIN, VICTORIA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGRIFFIN, VICTORIA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021DR000232, STROHMENGER, ANDREW J VS. FARQUHARSON, RONALD BRUCE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDDTINJ-2/11/2021" | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021DR000232, STROHMENGER, ANDREW J VS. FARQUHARSON, RONALD BRUCE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: EFORDDTINJ-2/11/2021" | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V ) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V ) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V ) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ATTORNEY: SHAFER, THEODORE CHARLES ASSIGNED | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | FAMILY COURT COVER SHEET ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.