Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Perez, Jeinel Euniser, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with NELSON, KATHRYN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNELSON, KATHRYN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, (SELF REPRESENTED). ASA STEVEN R. PAKU WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. INTERPRETER SPANISH PRESENT VIA TELECONFERENCE. DEFT ADVISED OF I.N.S. RIGHTS. THE DEFENDANT WAS SWORN. AND DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF GUILTY TO CT.1 DRIVING WITHOUT VALID LICENSE (322.03.1). THE COURT FOUND FACTUAL BASIS AND ACCEPTED PLEA. ANY UNPAID TRAFFIC INFRACTIONS DISMISSED BY THE COURT. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJUDICATION WITHHELD : PAY BY , 120 DAYS.. PAY: CT COST $256.00; COI $25.00; COP MM $100.00; BALANCE DUE = $381.00 . | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V ) | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADJL4IE | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ADJL4IE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 01/27/2021 | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NO DRIVER LICENSE RECORD FOUND | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/02/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CT000242 A | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT HEARING SET FOR 02/11/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | UNIFORM TRAFFIC CITATION ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.