Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Paku, Steven Russell, against Sheehan, Julia Marisa, represented by Ohle, Michael Robert, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with NELSON, KATHRYN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNELSON, KATHRYN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedJanuary 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: February 02, 2021DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )
Date: February 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
January 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH PRIVATE ATTORNEY MICHAEL R. OHLEVIA TELECONFERENCE, ASA DOUGLAS TOUGAS WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE VIA TELECONFERENCE. DEFT ADVISED OF I.N.S. RIGHTS. THE DEFENDANT WAS SWORN. AND DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.1 DRIVING UNDER THE INFLUENCE - IMPAIRMENT - PROPERTY DAMAGE - ONE PRIOR CONVICTION (316.193.3C1-2). AND NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.2 LSOA-CAUSING PROPERTY DAMAGE (316.061.1). AND NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.3 RECKLESS DRIVING CAUSING DAMAGE OR INJURY (316.192.3C1-2). PLEA FORM FILED IN OPEN COURT. THE COURT FOUND FACTUAL BASIS AND ACCEPTED PLEA. PAY IN EQUAL MONTHLY INSTALLMENTS WHILE ON PROBATION. MAY CONVERT TO COMMUNITY SERVICE HOURS AT THE RATE OF 10.00 PER HOUR. PLEA TO THE COURT. D. SHEEHAN (DEFT''S MOTHER) SWORN AND TESTIFIED. CASE CONTINUED TO 1:30 DOCKET ASA KEARNEY PRESENT VIA ZOOM. NO ALCOHOL/NO DRUGS WITHOUT A SCRIPT. DEFT ALLOWED TO DO MAIL IN PROBATION. DEFT''S FATHER J. SHEEHAN PRESENT SWORN AND TESITIFIED. COURT GIVES DEFT CREDIT FOR ATTENDING LEGACY HEALING CENTER IN LIEU OF COUNTYH JAIL. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJUDICATED GUILTY : 30 DAYS COUNTY JAIL. CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED, DEFT GIVEN CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED IN TREATMENT SERIVCE IN LIUE OF JAIL TIME.. 1 YEAR PROBATION, BALANCE.. 5 YEARS SUSPEND LICENSE. COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON RESTITUTION AMT.. DUI SCHOOL ORDERED, LEVEL II.. 2 YEARS INTERLOCK DEVICE ORDERED. IMMOBILIZE VEHICLE, WAIVED BY JUDGE.. VICTIM IMPACT PANEL ORDERED, LEVEL II.. RANDOM URINALYSIS , COMPLETE THROUGH TREATMENT PLAN.CT.2 ADJUDICATED GUILTY : TIME SERVED - RELEASE. 6 MONTHS PROBATION, CONCURRENT TO CT.1.CT.3 ADJUDICATED GUILTY : TIME SERVED - RELEASE. 6 MONTHS PROBATION, CONCURRENT TO CT.1.. PAY: CT COST $256.00; CT FINE $2,000.00; COI $35.00; COP MM $100.00; SURCHARGE $100.00; DUI COSTS $150.00; BALANCE DUE = $2,641.00 . | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 01/14/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: HEARING: DEFENDANT WAS NOT PRESENT, (PRESENCE WAIVED). PRIVATE ATTORNEY MICHAEL R. OHLE APPEARED FOR THE DEFENDANT, AND ASA NICOLE A. KOCIAN WERE PRESENT VIA TELECONFERENCE. CONTINUED FOR: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING: NEXT COURT DATE: 1/14/2022 11:00 AM WITH JUDGE NELSON K. | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021CT000235 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. SHEEHAN, JULIA MARISA - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-11/17/2021" | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 12/20/2021 AT 10:00 AM IN 2C/ , COUNTY JUDGE: NELSON, KATHRYN | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.