Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Paku, Steven Russell, against Rubi, Medelin Noemi, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with NELSON, KATHRYN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNELSON, KATHRYN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: ARRAIGNMENT HEARING: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, (SELF REPRESENTED). ASA STEVEN R. PAKU WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. DEFT ADVISED OF I.N.S. RIGHTS. THE DEFENDANT WAS SWORN. AND DEFENSE ENTERED A PLEA OF NOLO-CONTENDERE TO CT.1 NO DRIVERS LICENSE (322.03.1-2). THE COURT FOUND FACTUAL BASIS AND ACCEPTED PLEA. ANY UNPAID TRAFFIC INFRACTIONS DISMISSED BY THE COURT. , DISPOSITION: CT.1 ADJUDICATION WITHHELD : PAY BY , 150 DAYS OR SET UP A PAYMENT PLAN.. PAY: CT COST $256.00; COI $25.00; COP MM $100.00; BALANCE DUE = $381.00 . | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: PAKU, STEVEN RUSSELL ASSIGNED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINES AND COST DUE ( V ) | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $381.00 RECEIPT #2021000011431 | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - ADHZFIE | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION ADHZFIE FILED, OFFENSE DATE 01/21/2021 | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTY JUDGE NELSON, KATHRYN: ASSIGNED | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 01/28/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021CT000201 A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.