Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Nixon, Jalissa Nicole, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with NELSON, KATHRYN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNELSON, KATHRYN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - ADHZG7E | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - ADHZG7E | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE UPDATED : PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 09/05/2021 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $235.00 RECEIPT #2021000061414 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE CREATED : PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 02/23/2021 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND 2021AA037263 (322.03.1-2) RELEASED | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: SCHMIDT, DENNIS - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021CT000200 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. NIXON, JALISSA NICOLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: CDB-8/6/2021" | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLIANCE UPDATED : PAY FINE REQUIRED BY: 09/05/2021 COMPLETED 8/6/2021 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF COMPLIANCE AFFIDAVIT FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.