Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust C, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Elia, Mark Christopher, Vanness, John Anthony, against Gibbs, Donnie, Gibbs, Jacqueline E, in the jurisdiction of Santa Rosa County, FL, . Santa Rosa County, FL Superior Courts with DRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDRAKE, CLIFTON ALAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 19, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Rosa County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: November 19, 2019VALUE CALCULATION OF REAL PROPERTY
Date: November 19, 2019LIS PENDENS
Date: November 19, 2019CERTIFICATE OF POSSESSION OF NOTE
Date: November 19, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2019SUMMONS ISSUED (PROPOSED)
Date: November 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 31, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: August 07, 2020ORDER setting zoom hearing
Date: February 17, 2021MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 31, 2020ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS--ORIGINAL NOTE ORIGINAL MORTGAGE AND ALLONGE
Date: September 10, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED DONNIE GIBBS EMAILED ATTY
Date: November 19, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: August 31, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO JACQUELINE E GIBBS A/K/A JACQUELINE GIBBS ON 12/16/19
Date: December 23, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: November 19, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED TO DONALD GIBBS ON 12/16/19
Date: December 23, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED JACQUELINE E. GIBBS EMAILED TO ATTY
Date: November 19, 2019BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT - ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 29, 2021ANSWER OF DEFENDANT JACQUELINE GIBBS
Date: January 06, 2020DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: August 07, 2020NOTICE OF FILING
Date: March 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 31, 2020BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT - ORDER CONFIRMING PLAN
Date: March 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS
Date: August 31, 2020LETTER TO THE COURT
Date: September 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2021BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT-NOTICE OF CHAPTER 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE
Date: August 16, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: June 22, 2022MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2021NOTICE OF SALE SEPTEMBER 22 2022
Date: August 23, 2022RECORDED SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: August 29, 2022NOTICE OF SALE 8/16/2022
Date: July 14, 2022CIVIL RECORDED AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2022NOTICE OF SALE 7-6-21
Date: June 01, 2021CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: July 28, 2022MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE SALE AND TO RESCHEDULE SALE
Date: June 30, 2021NOTICE OF SALE 8/10/2021
Date: July 08, 2021RECORDED ORDER CANCELING THE FORECLOSURE SALE OF AUGUST 16 2022
Date: August 04, 2022CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: August 08, 2022RECORDED ORDER RESCHEDULING THE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: June 16, 2022BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT
Date: September 23, 2022CIVIL RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT
Date: April 21, 2021BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT
Date: August 30, 2022RECORDED SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: September 09, 2022SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: August 06, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: July 09, 2021PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF ADDITIONAL ADVANCES
Date: July 12, 2022MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING (To be held via ZOOM)
Date: July 19, 2022RECORDED ORDER RESCHEDULING THE FORECLOSURE SALE 09/22/2022
Date: August 22, 2022BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT
Date: September 08, 2022PROOF OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 30, 2021MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 17, 2022BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT - ORDER GRANTING CHAPTER 13
Date: August 10, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ORDER RESCHEDULING THE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: August 26, 2022BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT
Date: May 03, 2023BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT
Date: February 13, 2023BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT - ORDER CONFIRMING PLAN
Date: June 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT - ORDER CONFIRMING PLAN | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT-ORDER APPROVING APPLICATION FOR COMPENSATION OF ATTORNEY FEES FOR DEBTORS IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00 | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT APPLICATION FOR COMPENSATION OF ATTORNEY FEES FOR DEBTOR IN THE AMOUNT OF $500.00 | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | BANKRUPTCY DOCUMENT | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | RECORDED SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.