Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
High Douglas A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dismuke David C, against Olstad Dan, Universal Pro-Shooters, Llc., represented by Corso David A, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 07 CATHERINE L COMBEE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge07 CATHERINE L COMBEE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT - RESOLVED | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT DAN OLSTADS NOTICE OF SERVING JURAT PAGE | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDNATS NOTICE OF FILING JURAT PAGE | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO UNIVERSAL PRO SHOOTERS LLC | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DAN OLSTAD | |
January 30, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS DAN OLSTAD NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS UNIVERSAL PRO SHOOTERS LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.