Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ghanam, Louise, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Weber Alec L, against American Traditions Insurance Company, represented by Dylong Frank E Jr, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT - FULL SETTLEMENT | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF KEVIN GRUBBS | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 06/08/2020 11:00 AM | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.