Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Michele Medina On Behalf Of Minor, Justin Tuftan, Garcia Miguel Angel Jr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fontana Christopher G, against The Travelers Indemnity Company Of America, A Foreign Profit Corporation, represented by Gencel Yalkin Esq, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 DANA Y MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 08/19/2021 01:30 PM | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT FOR PLAINTIFFF MICHELE MEDINA ON BEHALF OF | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFFS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT- OTHER - PARTIAL | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.