Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Caliber Home Loans, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Poinciana Village Three Association, Inc., Association Of Poinciana Villages, Inc., Stephens-Aliyy, Maya, Aliyy, Usamah Abdul, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 26, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
December 28, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - MAYA STEPHENS-ALIYY | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - USAMAH ABDUL ALIYY | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED - POINCIANA VILLAGE THREE ASSOCIATION INC | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC ANSWER / RESPONSE | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - POINCIANA VILLAGE THREE ASSOCIATION INC | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - MAYA STEPHENS-ALIYY | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - ASSOCIATION OF POINCIANA VILLAGES INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.