Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cauffman Richard, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Cassel Michael A, against State Farm Florida Insurance Company, represented by Fuller M Megan, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2019 |
CategoryOthic - Insurance Claim |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 09, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL AND STAY ACTION PENDING APPRAISAL | |
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S AMENDED NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS AMENDED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PLAINTIFF'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
March 20, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.