Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bank Of America N A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Griffiths Heather, against Edsall, John R, Mount Olive Shores Lot Owners Association Of Polk County Inc, Patricia E Shaw A K A Patricia Shaw As Personal Representative Of The Estate Of Jeanne W Edsall Deceased, Shaw, Brian, Shaw, Michael P, (total of 7) See All represented by Appleton Eric N, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 STEVEN L SELPH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 STEVEN L SELPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E MAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2 516 | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | SPECIAL ORDER CANCELING AND DIRECTING THE RESCHEDULING OF FORECLOSURE SALES DURING COVID-19 | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED / PATRICIA E SHAW AKA PATRICIA SHAW AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.