Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mitravich, Telisha, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Wilson David Iv, against Auburndale Oaks Care Acquisition, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT -AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE ACQUISITION LLC | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 11/30/2020 01:30 PM | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ISSUED AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE ACQUISITION LLC (CLERK) | |
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/da15e21b-213d-4967-818e-3fbe0f2b3692/results/c5819069-4d5a-4dcf-9436-2d73f0c77aee/lines/aaefb5d3-652c-45a7-a7a2-c92e20fa4f0e/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED-AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE ACQUISITION, LLC |
|
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/da15e21b-213d-4967-818e-3fbe0f2b3692/results/c5819069-4d5a-4dcf-9436-2d73f0c77aee/lines/f698104a-51a9-4985-9c97-de8ff9ed2f6f/Doc SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED / AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE ACQUISITION LLC |
|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/da15e21b-213d-4967-818e-3fbe0f2b3692/results/c5819069-4d5a-4dcf-9436-2d73f0c77aee/lines/931cb77c-4b1a-41ed-a86a-bb31716f6f73/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - AUBURNDALE OAKS CARE ACQUISITION LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.