Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Long, Brock A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kopp Joshua A, against Progressive Select Insurance Company, A Foreign For Profit Corporation, Murphy Keeinan J., Murphy, Johnnie Lee, represented by Kemp Travis D, Wood Julian E Jr, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 JOHN RADABAUGH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 JOHN RADABAUGH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2019 |
CategoryNega - Negligence Auto |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 06/23/2020 03:00 PM | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN PARTY / JOHNNIE LEE MURPHY AND KEEINAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.