Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Speck, Margie, Lake, Georgie G, filed a(n) Nursing Home - Torts case represented by Delgado Jason R, against Nic 5 Spring Haven Leasing, Llc, Meridian Senior Living, Llc, Holiday Al Nic Management, Llc, Shrum, Henry Wade, Gahc4 Spring Haven Fl Trs Sub, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Graham Kara S, Becker Kurt A, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 18, 2019 |
CategoryNegnh - Negligence Nursing Home |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeNursing Home |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry deleted for: 10/29/2021 01:00 PM | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS GAHC4 SPRING HAVEN FL TRS SUB | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 10/29/2021 01:00 PM | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE -NIC 5 SPRING HAVEN LEASING LLC -HOLIDAY AL NIC MANAGEMENT | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFNEDANTS NIC 5 SPRING HAVEN LEASING LLC | |
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.