Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Gonzalez Waldemar P, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 07/13/2021 11:30 AM | |
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO WITHDRAW DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44fd32a-4fe8-49d7-a59e-bddd98ea7eaa/results/af2ff9df-4eb6-4de7-ba08-c339493d523c/lines/7480842e-d9e0-43bb-87f2-18ebce0589ad/Doc FINAL DISPOSITION FORM |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44fd32a-4fe8-49d7-a59e-bddd98ea7eaa/results/af2ff9df-4eb6-4de7-ba08-c339493d523c/lines/7480842e-d9e0-43bb-87f2-18ebce0589ad/Doc DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/c44fd32a-4fe8-49d7-a59e-bddd98ea7eaa/results/af2ff9df-4eb6-4de7-ba08-c339493d523c/lines/7480842e-d9e0-43bb-87f2-18ebce0589ad/Doc LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.