Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dolores Packett, Trustee Of The Dolores Packett Revocable Living Turst Dated May 30, 2006, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Miller Theodore R, against Unknown Tenant #2, Unknown Tenant #1, Asset Acceptance, Llc, The United States Of America, Brown, Stephanie Faye, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 08 JAMES A YANCEY presiding.
Case Number |
Judge08 JAMES A YANCEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 13, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfh - Foreclosure Homestead Residential |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Calendar entry added for: 06/11/2021 11:15 AM | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;197579;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/d74d63d4-db54-4009-903b-600a2d025268/results/9c91c6b2-6157-42d4-841a-11c7c6dfb482/lines/cb07c62a-c349-49ac-bb0f-da4e36b50640/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / UNKNOWN TENANT #2 |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/d74d63d4-db54-4009-903b-600a2d025268/results/9c91c6b2-6157-42d4-841a-11c7c6dfb482/lines/eb89cca1-7752-47f4-a279-dfd017375462/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/d74d63d4-db54-4009-903b-600a2d025268/results/9c91c6b2-6157-42d4-841a-11c7c6dfb482/lines/eb89cca1-7752-47f4-a279-dfd017375462/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / UNKNOWN TENANT #1 |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/d74d63d4-db54-4009-903b-600a2d025268/results/9c91c6b2-6157-42d4-841a-11c7c6dfb482/lines/eb89cca1-7752-47f4-a279-dfd017375462/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/d74d63d4-db54-4009-903b-600a2d025268/results/9c91c6b2-6157-42d4-841a-11c7c6dfb482/lines/eb89cca1-7752-47f4-a279-dfd017375462/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK / STEPHANIE FAVE BROWN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.