Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Island Club West Homeowner'S Association Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ballard Laura M, against Unknown Parties In Possession, Feest, Terry, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 11 WAYNE DURDEN presiding.
Case Number |
Judge11 WAYNE DURDEN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryRpmfo - Other Real Property Actions |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
January 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/79d58554-4ff0-429c-9143-de339013fd70/results/dbe7a8f0-9009-4bf7-95f8-76d8a3c71813/lines/a2b4e0f2-aecb-466c-85cc-2668bda76c90/Doc WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS - TERRY FEEST |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/79d58554-4ff0-429c-9143-de339013fd70/results/dbe7a8f0-9009-4bf7-95f8-76d8a3c71813/lines/0463664c-ba56-4623-ad68-126bdd40a007/Doc ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND CASE STYLE |
|
December 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/79d58554-4ff0-429c-9143-de339013fd70/results/dbe7a8f0-9009-4bf7-95f8-76d8a3c71813/lines/8565d87d-a33a-413b-bdde-ee72cdde6818/Doc LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE- RECEIVED BY JUDGE |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;46882;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/79d58554-4ff0-429c-9143-de339013fd70/results/dbe7a8f0-9009-4bf7-95f8-76d8a3c71813/lines/0a8f16ad-67b5-4bd0-bca0-766139cb0c15/Doc PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND CASE STYLE |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;110438;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/79d58554-4ff0-429c-9143-de339013fd70/results/dbe7a8f0-9009-4bf7-95f8-76d8a3c71813/lines/4f403db5-05fc-4aa4-89c0-3fb21c0d00a9/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-TERRY FEEST |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
application/pdf;111589;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/d08332d6-feb3-4cc0-a5b6-b35e309d4040/runs/cs-65ddc264ab7389a7b4321672d8350240/executions/79d58554-4ff0-429c-9143-de339013fd70/results/dbe7a8f0-9009-4bf7-95f8-76d8a3c71813/lines/47115e74-3242-4951-b294-f140a178ee9c/Doc SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK-UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION |
|
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.