Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Strickland Stephen, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Edwards John D, against American Bankers Insurance Company Of Florida, represented by Prusak Gregory J, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 15 WILLIAM D SITES presiding.
Case Number |
Judge15 WILLIAM D SITES Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2020 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF THE DEFENDANTS CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED ON AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, AMERICAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS | |
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK/ AMEIRCAN BANKERS INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA | |
November 08, 2019 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEP DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS CLAIMS ADJUSTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.