Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Burke Paul W, against Barber, Susan R, in the jurisdiction of Polk County, FL, . Polk County, FL Superior Courts with 04 DANA Y MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
Judge04 DANA Y MOORE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCont - Contract & Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedApril 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPolk County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Case Outcome TypeClosed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANTS SUSAN R BARBER | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PENDING SETTLEMENT | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO EXTEND SERVICE TIME AS T DEFENDANT | |
April 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED BY CLERK - SUSAN R BARBER | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND SERVICE TIME AND INCORPORATED BRIEF IN SUPPORT | |
March 31, 2021 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE OF SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANT SUSAN R BARBER | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.