Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gonzalez Rivera, Jesus Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION FILED AEE2NGE
Date: April 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED CASE DISMISSED-PURSUANT TO PLEA **********************CASE CLOSED********************** | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMCC WAIVED $71.35 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMSC WAIVED $12.65 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | TNMFN WAIVED $30.00 | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | TRAPOT WAIVED $2.00 | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT PLED NOT GUILTY YOU ARE TO MAKE AN APPOINTMENT WITH YOUR ATTORNEY BEFORE NEXT COURT DATE CASE SET FOR COMPANION INFRACTION | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 05/25/2021 AT 2:30 PM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 04/08/2021 AT 2:00 PM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.