Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gonzalez Rivera, Jesus Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT PLAN APPLICATION & AGREEMENT
Date: October 12, 2022COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE FAILED TO RETURN AFTER COURT OR PRISON - 60 DAYS
Date: February 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT TO REINSTATE DRIVER LICENSE/PRIVILEGE (FOS)
Date: October 12, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.