Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Reavely, Richard D, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT $273.00 RECEIPT #2021035289
Date: April 16, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: April 08, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: March 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $273.00 RECEIPT #2021035289 | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | * TO PAY COURT COSTS (FINE NOT INCLUDED) OF $273.00 (X) PAY AT A RATE OF $25.00 PER MONTH STARTING MAY 2021 * YOU MUST REPORT IMMEDIATELY TO THE CLERK'S COLLECTIONS & COMPLIANCE PROGRAM LOCATED ON THE 2ND FLOOR TO PAY YOUR MONETARY OBLIGATIONS OR MAKE PAYMENT ARRANGEMENTS. IF YOU ARE INCARCERATED, YOU MUST REPORT WITHIN FIVE (5) BUSINESS DAYS OF RELEASE. IF A DEFENDANT IS SENTENCED TO A PERIOD OF CONFINEMENT AND IS SUBJECT TO AN IMMIGRATION DETAINER, THE SENTENCE MAY BE REDUCED BY A PERIOD OF NOT MORE THAN TWELVE DAYS ON THE DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS' DETERMINATION THAT THE REDUCTION IN SENTENCE WILL FACILITATE TRANSFER OF THE DEFENDANT INTO FEDERAL CUSTODY. - RECORDED (OR.5931.186. / 2021052934) | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | 0 DAYS | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 04/08/2021 AT 9:45 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED ADO56OE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.