Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Pagan Rivera, Jose filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Russell, John Robert Jr, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT $666.00 RECEIPT #2021062662
Date: July 13, 2021COMPLETION CERTIFICATE-DRIVING SCHOOL 8 HR AGGRESIVE DRIVER
Date: July 09, 2021DEFENDANTS WITNESS LIST
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.