Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Figueroa-Reyes, Raul, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL C JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL C JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2021 |
CategoryCriminal Traffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2021081591
Date: September 13, 2021PAYMENT $298.00 RECEIPT #2021108456
Date: December 08, 2021PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: May 25, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.